House
|
06/26/2017
|
Effective date: 08/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 415.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Lambert, and White.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Schexnayder, Jackson, and Abramson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 1. The Senate amendments were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|