Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 13. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported without amendments (6-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported with amendments (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|