House
|
06/30/2017
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2017
|
Becomes Act No. 429.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2017
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 31. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported with amendments (7-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported with amendments (24-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|