Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|