House | 05/30/2017 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17. | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17. | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Prefiled. |