Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 3 yeas and 33 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|