House
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Barrow, and Allain.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Henry, Miguez, and Smith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title and advanced to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 3 for 05/04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported with amendments (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|