Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported with amendments (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|