House
|
06/26/2017
|
Effective date: 07/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 418.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Allain, and Luneau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Magee, Abramson, and Miguez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|