Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|