Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 20. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 29. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported with amendments (7-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported favorably (18-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|