House
|
06/16/2017
|
Effective date: 08/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 307.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported favorably (8-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|