House | 05/11/2017 | Becomes HB 682. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Reported by substitute (13-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Prefiled. |