Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and rejected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|