Senate | 05/22/2017 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Prefiled. |