House
|
06/22/2017
|
Effective date: 06/22/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 351.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 3, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 34. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|