Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|