House
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective date: 08/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 92.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|