Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read by title. Indefinitely postponed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported without action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 14. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|