House | 05/24/2017 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 40. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported with amendments (8-5). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Prefiled. |