House
|
06/26/2017
|
Effective date: 07/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 48.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Allain, and Hewitt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Henry, Schroder, and Barras.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 2 for 05/04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported with amendments (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|