House
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice of Senate rejecting Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read; failed to be adopted by a vote of 14 yeas and 13 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 72, nays 24. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Fannin, and Donahue.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Broadwater, Abramson, and Jim Morris.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 34. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported favorably (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|