House
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 126.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|