House
|
06/08/2017
|
By a vote of 60 yeas, 40 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Re-urged.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
By a vote of 69 yeas, 32 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 31 yeas and 5 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after the 57 calendar day by a vote of 24 yeas and 11 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title and advanced to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 23. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 42. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|