House
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective date: 01/01/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 264.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 59, nays 26, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
The amended bill was read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 15 yeas and 11 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 426 reported by the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure (6-0-1).
|
|
|