House
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective date: 10/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 265.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 68, nays 26, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 14 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 177 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (13-0).
|
|
|