House | 05/25/2017 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 22, nays 64. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/24/2017 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17. | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17. | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 465 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works (13-0). |