Senate | 05/30/2017 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 530 reported by the Committee on Appropriations (16-0). Recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |