House | 06/08/2017 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 06/05/2017 | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. | ||
House | 06/04/2017 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |