House | 06/12/2017 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2017 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/08/2017 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. | ||
House | 06/05/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/17. | ||
House | 06/05/2017 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |