Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 86, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17. | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17. | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Reported favorably (9-0-1). | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |