Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 81, nays 7. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17. | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Reported with amendments (17-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Prefiled. |