Senate | 06/02/2017 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 85, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/01/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. | ||
House | 06/01/2017 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |