House
|
06/08/2017
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Rules suspended. Read by title and advanced to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|