House
|
06/08/2017
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported favorably (9-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|