House
|
06/05/2017
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2017
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution, having the required two-thirds vote of the elected members, was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported with amendments (20-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|