House
|
06/02/2017
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 88, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|