House | 06/05/2017 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2017 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/04/2017 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/04/2017 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | Reported favorably (14-0). | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |