House
|
06/05/2017
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably (13-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Discharged from the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|