House | 06/05/2017 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/04/2017 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/01/2017 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. | ||
House | 06/01/2017 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Reported favorably (7-1-1). | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |