LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2017 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR203
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HR203
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2017 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR203
Action History
House
06/09/2017
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
House
06/08/2017
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
House
06/07/2017
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
House
06/06/2017
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/17.
House
06/05/2017
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/17.
House
06/05/2017
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.