LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2017 Regular Session
House
Bills
HSR1
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HSR1
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2017 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HSR1
Action History
House
05/10/2017
Approved on 5/10/2017.
House
05/08/2017
Study request list distributed to members on 5/8/2017.
House
04/25/2017
Received on 4/25/2017.