Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Effective date 8/1/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 49.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|