Senate | 05/17/2017 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |