Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective date 8/1/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 277.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 67, nays 35. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 46, nays 44. The Conference Committee Report was rejected.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 11 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2017
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
House conferees appointed: Magee, Mack, and Stefanski.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2017
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2017
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Martiny, and Carter.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 13 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2017
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|