House | 05/30/2017 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2017 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |