Senate
|
06/23/2017
|
Effective date 6/23/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 426.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|