Senate | 05/30/2017 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2017 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |