House | 04/24/2017 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 6 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |