Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Effective date 6/22/2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 324.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2017
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2017
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|